THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 6:25:11 AM
Barnes, Alison Gabrielle
CPSO#:
88909
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Mar 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Mar 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
South Ottawa Medical Centre
2-1650 Queensdale Ave
Ottawa ON K1T 1N8
Phone: 613-244-4400
Fax: 613-244-3399
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Queensway Carleton Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:22 Dec 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALISON GABRIELLE BARNES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARNES is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 23 Jun 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Mar 2015 |