skip to content

Barker, Eric James

CPSO#: 25699

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 22 Jun 1973

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Eric Barker, Medicine, Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 13 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: Paitents may obtain their records at: Lead FHO Physician Allied Health Bldg Ste 202 369 Mary St Wiarton ON N0H 2T0
Date Received: 06 Feb 2019


Address: c/o Dr. Eric Barker PO Box 591 Wiarton, ON N0H 2T0
Date Received: 22 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1974 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018