THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 13:53:16 PM
Barker, Eric James
CPSO#:
25699
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
22 Jun 1973
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Eric Barker, Medicine, Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 13 2018
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Paitents may obtain their records at:
Lead FHO Physician
Allied Health Bldg
Ste 202
369 Mary St
Wiarton ON N0H 2T0
Date Received: 06 Feb 2019
Instructions/Address:c/o Dr. Eric Barker
PO Box 591
Wiarton, ON N0H 2T0
Date Received: 22 May 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1974 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 1973 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2018 |