skip to content

Bardai, Sadrudin Jamal Karim

CPSO#: 28543

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 07 Jun 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Swahili

Education:University of Manchester, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS - Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St Regis Crescent S, North York, ON M3J 1Y6 Tel: 1-866-245-7607 ext 2. Email: [email protected]
Date Received: 07 Jun 2018


Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent South Toronto ON M3J 1Y6 Website: www.rsrs.com Tel: (416) 398-0638 Fax: (416) 398-5932 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 26 Jan 2015

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2014
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jun 2018