THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 5:49:29 AM
Bardai, Sadrudin Jamal Karim
CPSO#:
28543
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
07 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
03 Feb 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati, Swahili
Education: Manchester Medical School, 1963
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:RSRS - Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St Regis Crescent S, North York, ON M3J 1Y6
Tel: 1-866-245-7607 ext 2.
Email: [email protected]
Date Received: 07 Jun 2018
Instructions/Address:Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St. Regis Crescent South
Toronto ON M3J 1Y6
Website: www.rsrs.com
Tel: (416) 398-0638
Fax: (416) 398-5932
Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 26 Jan 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jul 1976 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 26 Sep 2014 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 26 Sep 2014 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Feb 2015 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 07 Jun 2018 |