skip to content

Baral, Stefan David

CPSO#: 86021

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Mar 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Mar 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Swedish

Education:Queen's University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
200-59 Adelaide St E
Scarborough Village Residence
Inner City Health Associates
Toronto ON  M5C 1K6
Phone: 4165914411 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:09 Dec 2009 CFPC Specialist
Community Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. STEFAN DAVID BARAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jul 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2016