THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 16:40:13 PM
Baral, Stefan David
CPSO#:
86021
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Mar 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Mar 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Swedish
Education: Queen's University, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
200-59 Adelaide St E
Scarborough Village Residence
Inner City Health Associates
Toronto ON M5C 1K6
Phone: 4165914411
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:09 Dec 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Community Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. STEFAN DAVID BARAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARAL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Community Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Mar 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jan 2010 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 07 Jul 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Mar 2016 |