skip to content

Bangert, Elvira Rashidovna

CPSO#: 95890

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Sep 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Nov 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Tashkent Pediatric Medical Institute, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
60 Murray Street Room L2-004 Box 9
Toronto, Ontario M5T 3L9
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone: 416-586-4800
Fax: 416-586-8766 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:19 Oct 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ELVIRA RASHIDOVNA BANGERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BANGERT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
AVP - Neurology

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2011 to 23 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2012 to 31 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 19 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 20 Oct 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Nov 2016