THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 3:43:44 AM
Bangert, Elvira Rashidovna
CPSO#:
95890
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Sep 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Nov 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Tashkent Pediatric Medical Institute, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1-464 Welland Ave
St Catharines ON L2M 5V4
Phone: 9056857555
Fax: 9056462442
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:19 Oct 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ELVIRA RASHIDOVNA BANGERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BANGERT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
AVP - Neurology
McMaster University, 24 Sep 2011 to 23 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
McMaster University, 24 Sep 2012 to 31 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
McMaster University, 01 Nov 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 19 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 20 Oct 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator