skip to content

Bala, Vinchala Morzaria

CPSO#: 94779

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Nov 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Nov 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Queensland, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Access Alliance
Suite 500
340 College Street
Toronto ON  M6N 4B4
Phone: 416-324-9490 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Inner City Health Associates
59 Adelaide St E
Second Floor
Toronto ON  M5C 1K6
Canada
Phone: 416-591-4411
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. VINCHALA MORZARIA BALA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 08 Feb 2011 to 02 May 2011
AVP - Family Medicine

Western University, 03 May 2011 to 07 Feb 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 08 Feb 2012 to 07 Feb 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 May 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Feb 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 13 Nov 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 2014