THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 14:12:18 PM
Bala, Vinchala Morzaria
CPSO#:
94779
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Nov 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Nov 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Queensland Faculty of Medi, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Access Alliance
Suite 500
340 College Street
Toronto ON M6N 4B4
Phone: 416-324-9490
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:17 Jun 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. VINCHALA MORZARIA BALA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 08 Feb 2011 to 02 May 2011
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 03 May 2011 to 07 Feb 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 08 Feb 2012 to 07 Feb 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 08 Feb 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 May 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 07 Feb 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 25 Oct 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 13 Nov 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Nov 2014 |