skip to content

Baker, Robert Stanley

CPSO#: 19061

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Jul 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 15 Jul 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Baker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 19 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: McLean Clinic 50 Burnhamthorpe Road West Mississauga, ON L5B 3C2
Date Received: 15 Jul 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:30 Nov 1965 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1960
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Jul 2015