THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 23:11:36 PM
Baker, Robert Stanley
CPSO#:
19061
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
15 Jul 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
02 Jun 1964
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1960
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Baker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 19 2015
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:McLean Clinic
50 Burnhamthorpe Road West
Mississauga, ON L5B 3C2
Date Received: 15 Jul 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Nov 1965 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jul 1960 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jun 1964 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 15 Jul 2015 |