skip to content

Baitz, Thomas

CPSO#: 20774

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Jun 1967
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 31 May 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German, Hungarian

Education:University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 113
820 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 4M4
Phone: (613) 933-1214
Fax: (613) 933-4523 Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:14 Nov 1966 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1967
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 May 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 31 May 2017
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 12 Feb 2020
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 13 Mar 2020
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 24 Mar 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 31 May 2017 Active
 
Dr. Baitz has completed the supervision and reassessment requirements of the undertaking signed May 31, 2017 (below). The following practice restrictions will remain as follows:

Dr. Baitz will restrict his practice to an office-based practice;

Dr. Baitz will advise all patients with diabetes to attend the local Diabetes Education Centre on an annual basis.

As from May 31, 2017, the following is imposed as a terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Thomas Baitz, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Baitz to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
("Undertaking")
                  
of
                  
DR. THOMAS BAITZ
("Dr. Baitz")
                  
to 

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")
                  
A.    PREAMBLE

(1)   In this Undertaking:

"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended; 
       
"ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of the College;

"OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
"Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the public.
                  
(2)   I, Dr. Baitz, certificate of registration number 20774, am a member of the College.  The College has received information regarding my standard of practice.
                 
(3)   I, Dr. Baitz, acknowledge that the College initiated an investigation bearing File Number 7214950 (the "Investigation") into my standard of practice.

(4)   I, Dr. Baitz, acknowledge that, after the College receives an original copy of this Undertaking as signed by me, no further action will be taken on the Investigation.
                 
B.    UNDERTAKING

(5)   I, Dr. Baitz, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.

(6)   Practice Restrictions

(a)   I, Dr. Baitz, undertake that, effective immediately, my practice will be restricted to an office-based practice.  For further clarity, I undertake not to work any shifts at the Cornwall Community Hospital in the Emergency Room, the Intensive Care Unit or in any acute care capacity, including that I will not perform consultations or be the Most Responsible Physician for any inpatient. 

(b)   I, Dr. Baitz, undertake that at the first available opportunity I will advise all current patients diagnosed with diabetes, and each new patient with a diagnosis of diabetes, to attend the local Diabetes Education Centre on an annual basis.  I further undertake to advise all patients with a diagnosis of diabetes to obtain regular foot and eye examinations. 
                                                
(7)   Clinical Supervision 

(a)   I, Dr. Baitz, undertake to practise under the guidance of a clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical Supervisor(s)"), for six (6) months ("Clinical Supervision"). 
                        
(b)   I, Dr. Baitz, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s). The Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum: 

(i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the Individualized Education Plan ("IEP"), attached hereto as Appendix "B";

(ii)  Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location approved by the College, once every month;

(iii) Review at least ten (10) of my patient charts at every meeting;

 (iv)  Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
(v)   Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and ongoing professional development and inquire into my compliance with the recommendations; 
                              
(vi)  Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical Supervision; and

(vii) Submit written reports to the College at least once every three (3) months, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor(s) has concerns about my standard of practice.
                              
(c)   I, Dr. Baitz, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the educational needs identified in the IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B", as well as the areas of concern identified in the report of the medical inspector dated December 12, 2016 and the supplemental report, received by the College on March 15, 2017, and concerns that may arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.
                                             
(d)   I, Dr. Baitz, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this Undertaking and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and to abide by the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing professional development.
                                          
(e)   I, Dr. Baitz, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.

(f)   I, Dr. Baitz, undertake that if a person who has given an undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the College within that time.
                                          
(g)   I, Dr. Baitz, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (7)(e) and/or (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                                           
(h)   I, Dr. Baitz, acknowledge that if I am required to cease practise as a result of section (7)(g) above this will constitute a term, condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that term, condition or limitation will be included on the public register.
                                          
(8)   Professional Education  

(a)   I, Dr. Baitz, undertake to participate in and successfully complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B", including all of the following professional education (the "Professional Education"):
                                          
(i)   a program(s) satisfactory to the College in medical record keeping; and

(ii)  any additional professional education recommended by my Clinical Supervisor(s).
                              
(b)   I, Dr. Baitz, undertake to provide proof to the College of my successful completion of the Professional Education, including proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have successfully completed the Professional Education.
                                           
(c)   I, Dr. Baitz, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the Professional Education.
                        
(d)   I, Dr. Baitz, undertake to complete this requirement within six (6) months of signing this Undertaking, or, if no satisfactory program is available by that time, by the first possible opportunity thereafter.
                                          
(9)   Reassessment of Practice

(a)   I, Dr. Baitz, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (7) above and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, I will submit to a reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor(s)").  I acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a chart review, direct observation of my care, interviews with colleagues and co-workers, feedback from patients and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.
                                          
(b)   I, Dr. Baitz, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment, conducted under the term of this Undertaking. 
                                          
(c)   I, Dr. Baitz, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor(s) may receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may discuss with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from the Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and the report may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                                          
(d)   I, Dr. Baitz, acknowledge that if I am of the view that any of the Assessor(s)'s recommendations are unreasonable, I will have thirty (30) days following my receipt of the recommendations within which to provide the College with my submissions in this regard.  I further acknowledge that thereafter, the ICR Committee will consider my submissions and make a determination regarding whether or not the recommendations, or any of them, are reasonable and if so, whether they, or any of them, constitute limitations or restrictions on my practice, and that decision will be provided to me. 
 
 (e)   I, Dr. Baitz, undertake that, following the decision referenced in section (9)(d) above, I will abide by those recommendations of the Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has determined are reasonable. 
                                          
(f)   I, Dr. Baitz, hereby consent to the following being included on the public register as terms, conditions or limitations on my certificate of registration, for the purposes of section 23 of the code:
                        
(i)   any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which the ICR Committee has identified in its decision referenced in section (9)(d) as terms, conditions or limitations on my practice.
                                                
(10)  Monitoring 

(a)   I, Dr. Baitz, undertake to inform the College of each and every location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.
                                          
 (b)   I, Dr. Baitz, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s) and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                                          
(c)   I, Dr. Baitz, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 

(d)   I, Dr. Baitz, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form, attached hereto as Appendix "C". 

 C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(11)  I, Dr. Baitz, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.
                  
(12)  I, Dr. Baitz, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

(13)  I, Dr. Baitz, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.
                  
(14)  I, Dr. Baitz, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").
                  
(15)  I, Dr. Baitz, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee of the College.
                  
(16) I, Dr. Baitz, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code.

(17)  Public Register

(a)   I, Dr. Baitz, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.
                                          
(b)   I, Dr. Baitz, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (17)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                                          
A College investigation was conducted into Dr. Baitz's standard of practice.  As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Baitz will restrict his practice to an office-based practice;

Dr. Baitz will advise all patients with diabetes to attend the local Diabetes Education Centre on an annual basis; 

Dr. Baitz will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for six (6) months;

 Dr. Baitz will engage in professional education in medical record-keeping; and

Dr. Baitz's practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within six (6) months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.

D.    CONSENT

(18)  I, Dr. Baitz, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the following information to any person who requires this information for the purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education andto all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:
                  
(a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking;

(b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment of, my practice; and 

(c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(19)  I, Dr. Baitz, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.
                  
(20)  I, Dr. Baitz, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any information:
                  
(a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
(b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking set out at Appendix "A" to this Undertaking;

(c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
(d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this Undertaking; and/or

(e)   which comes to their attention in the course of providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.
                        

                        

Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: January 13, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)

 

Source: Member
Active Date: May 31, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Thomas Baitz to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective May 31, 2017:

A College investigation was conducted into Dr. Baitz’s standard of practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Baitz will restrict his practice to an office-based practice;

Dr. Baitz will advise all patients with diabetes to attend the local Diabetes Education Centre on an annual basis;

Dr. Baitz will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for six (6) months;

Dr. Baitz will engage in professional education in medical record-keeping; and

Dr. Baitz’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within six (6) months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.