THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 21:33:48 PM
Baitz, Thomas
CPSO#:
20774
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jan 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
31 May 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, German, Hungarian
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 1961
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:14 Nov 1966 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jun 1967 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 31 May 2017 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 May 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 12 Feb 2020 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 13 Mar 2020 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 24 Mar 2020 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jan 2022 |
Concerns
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: January 13, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:
Download Full Document (PDF)
Source:
Member
Active Date: May 31, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Thomas Baitz to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective May 31, 2017:
A College investigation was conducted into Dr. Baitz’s standard of practice. As a result of the investigation:
Dr. Baitz will restrict his practice to an office-based practice;
Dr. Baitz will advise all patients with diabetes to attend the local Diabetes Education Centre on an annual basis;
Dr. Baitz will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for six (6) months;
Dr. Baitz will engage in professional education in medical record-keeping; and
Dr. Baitz’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within six (6) months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.