skip to content

Bacchus, Rahman

CPSO#: 31241

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 14 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 14 Jun 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. R. Bacchus Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 2 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients who wish to obtain their medical record may send a letter to 7-1275 Walker Road, Windsor, ON, N8Y 4X9
Date Received: 07 Jun 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 24 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Jun 2019