THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 13:25:14 PM
Bacchus, Rahman
CPSO#:
31241
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
14 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
29 Nov 1979
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of the West Indies, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. R. Bacchus Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 2 2018
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients who wish to obtain their medical record may send a letter to 7-1275 Walker Road, Windsor, ON, N8Y 4X9
Date Received: 07 Jun 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:12 Nov 1979 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:24 Nov 1980 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 1977 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Nov 1979 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 14 Jun 2019 |