skip to content

Trinos, Baieruss M

CPSO#: 90449

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Medical University of the Americas, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Citrus Medical Centre
605 Royal York Road
Toronto ON  M8Y 4G5
Phone: (416) 800-6500
Fax: (416) 342-1790 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Bridgepoint Active Healthcare
Sinai Health System
1 Bridgepoint Drive
Toronto ON  M4M 2B5
Canada
Phone: (416) 461-8252 Ext. 3700
Fax: (416) 470-6722
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Baieruss Trinos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 23 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Trinos ( CPSO# 90449 )

Business Address:
1 Bridgepoint Drive
Toronto ON  M4M 2B5
Phone Number: (416) 461-8252

Business Address:
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9

Business Address:
605 Royal York Road
Toronto ON  M8Y 4G5


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BAIERUSS M TRINOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRINOS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011