skip to content

Bell, Benjamin Richard

CPSO#: 88772

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
Baruch/Weisz Outpatient Care Clinic
GSE-140
4001 Leslie St
Willowdale ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6000
Fax: (647) 494-8917 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Keele Medical Place
2830 Keele Street
Second Floor
Willowdale ON  M3M 3E5
Canada
Phone: (416) 633-6812
Fax: 6474948917
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: B.R. Bell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Bell ( CPSO# 86827 )
Dr. B. Bell ( CPSO# 88772 )

Business Address:
2830 Keele Street
2nd Floor
North York ON  M3M 3E5
Phone Number: (416) 633-6812

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Willowdale ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (647) 490-1335

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BENJAMIN RICHARD BELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012