skip to content

Azharuddin, Tahera

CPSO#: 93984

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Dec 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 10 Dec 2010
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Telugu, Urdu

Education:Dr. N.T.R University of Health Sciences, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rochester Family Medicine PC
1308 W Auburn Rd
Rochester Hills MI  48309
United States
Phone: (248) 266-9504
Fax: (888) 977-1745

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Florida

USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jul 2011 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Dec 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Dec 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 05 Apr 2012

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2012 Active
             Dr.  Tahera  Azharuddin may practise medicine independently in Family Medicine,
            only.