THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 8:07:10 AM
Azharuddin, Tahera
CPSO#:
93984
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Dec 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
10 Dec 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Telugu, Urdu
Education: Dr. N.T.R University of Health Sciences, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
3350 SW 148th Ave Ste 300
Hollywood FL 33027-3259
United States
Phone: (888) 450-1572
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California
USA - Florida
USA - Michigan
USA - Texas
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:05 Jul 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Dec 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Dec 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Mar 2012 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 05 Apr 2012 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Mar 2012 |
|
Active |