Azam, Afshan (CPSO#: 99048)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 06 Jul 2012

Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:Aga Khan University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cedarbrae Medical Center
3630 Lawrence Ave East
Suite 100
Scarborough ON  M1G 1P6
Phone: (416) 901-6370
Fax: (647) 689-3546
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Afshan Azam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 22 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Azam ( CPSO# 99048 )

Business Address:
3630 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1G 1P6
Phone Number: (416) 901-6370

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Ohio

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jul 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Jul 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 05 Jan 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Apr 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 17 Apr 2014

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status More Information
Registration Committee Effective: 17 Apr 2014 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Afshan Azam may practise medicine independently in family medicine, only.