skip to content

Azam, Afshan

CPSO#: 99048

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 06 Jul 2012
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:Aga Khan University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cedarbrae Medical Center
3630 Lawrence Ave East
Suite 100
Scarborough ON  M1G 1P6
Phone: (416) 901-6370
Fax: (647) 689-3546 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Afshan Azam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 22 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Azam ( CPSO# 99048 )

Business Address:
3630 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1G 1P6
Phone Number: (416) 901-6370


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Ohio

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:06 Jul 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Jul 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 05 Jan 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Apr 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 17 Apr 2014

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 17 Apr 2014 Active
             Dr. Afshan Azam may practise medicine independently in family medicine, only.