skip to content

Azad, Sanjay Mahendra

CPSO#: 100465

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 May 2013
EXPIRY DATE
28 May 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 29 May 2013
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Armed Forces Medical College, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Medical Centre
360 - 63 Algoma St N
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 4Z6
Phone: (807) 345-5455 Electoral District: 09

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sanjay Azad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 22 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Azad ( CPSO# 100465)

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Medical Centre
Suite 360 3rd Floor
63 North Algoma Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 4Z6
Phone Number: (807) 345-5455

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 29 May 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 May 2013
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 May 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 25 May 2014
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 30 Apr 2019
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 28 May 2020

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 10 May 2019 Active
 
            (1 of 2)
            As  from  April  30,  2019,  the  following is imposed as terms, conditions and
            limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Sanjay Mahendra Azad
            in accordance with an undertaking
            and consent given by Dr. Azad to the  College  of  Physicians  and  Surgeons of
            Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")
                                                  of
                                       DR. SANJAY MAHENDRA AZAD
                                             ("Dr. Azad")
                                                  to 
                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")



            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule  2
                  to  the  Regulated  Health  Professions  Act,  1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints  and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                   "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that  is  available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Azad, certificate of registration number 100465, am  a  member  of
                  the College.  

            (3)   I,  Dr.  Azad, acknowledge that following a public complaint, the College
                  conducted   an   investigation   bearing   File   Number   1104725   (the
                  "Investigation") into my plastic surgery practice.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I,  Dr.  Azad,  undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective upon the date this Undertaking is approved by the ICR Committee
                  ("Effective Date").

            (5)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Azad, undertake to practise under the guidance of a clinical
                        supervisor  or  clinical supervisors acceptable to the College (the
                        "Clinical Supervisor"  or  "Clinical  Supervisors"),  for three (3)
                        months ("Clinical Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I,  Dr.  Azad,  acknowledge  that  I  have  reviewed  the  Clinical
                        Supervisor's  undertaking,  attached  hereto  as  Appendix "A", and
                        understand  what  is  required  of  the  Clinical  Supervisor.  The
                        Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate   the   education   program   set   out   in   the
                              Individualized  Education  Plan  ("IEP"),  attached hereto as
                              Appendix "B";
                        (ii)  Review the materials provided by the College;
                        (iii) Meet  with  me  at my Practice Location, or another  location
                              approved  by  the  College,   once  within  three  months  of
                              completing the Advanced Burn Life  Support  (ABLS) Course and
                              review of the American Burn Association Guidelines;
                        (iv)  Discuss with me what I have learned from the  ABLS Course and
                              the  American Burn Association Practice Guidelines  for  Burn
                              Resuscitation;
                        (v)   Make recommendations  to  me  for  practice  improvements and
                              ongoing professional development; 
                        (vi)  Perform  any other duties, such as reviewing other  documents
                              or conducting  interviews  with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical   Supervisor   deems  necessary   to   my   Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                        (vii) Submit one (1) written report  to  the College within one (1)
                              month following our discussion.
                  
                  (c)   I,  Dr.  Azad,  undertake  to  cooperate fully  with  the  Clinical
                        Supervision  of  my practice, conducted  under  the  term  of  this
                        Undertaking and Appendix  "A"  to this Undertaking, and to abide by
                        the recommendations of my Clinical  Supervisor,  including  but not
                        limited  to,  any  recommended  practice  improvements  and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (d)   I,  Dr.  Azad,  undertake  to  ensure  that  Appendix  "A"  to this
                        Undertaking  is  signed  and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the effective date.
                  
                  (e)   I,  Dr.  Azad,  undertake  that  if  a  person  who  has  given  an
                        undertaking  in Appendix "A"  to  this  Undertaking  is  unable  or
                        unwilling to continue  to  fulfill  its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice  of  same,  obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified  person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (f)   I,  Dr.  Azad,  undertake  that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions  set  out under sections (5)(d) and/or
                        (e) above, I will cease practising medicine  until  such  time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Azad, acknowledge that if I am required to cease practise as
                        a  result  of  section  (5)(f)  above  this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate  of registration and that
                        term,  condition  or  limitation  will be included  on  the  public
                        register.
                  
            (6)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Azad, undertake to participate  in and successfully complete
                        all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached  hereto  as Appendix "B",
                        including   all  of  the  following  professional  education   (the
                        "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   Review  and  discuss  with Clinical Supervisor: American Burn
                              Association Practice Guidelines for Burn Resuscitation; 
                        (ii)  Advanced Burn Life Support (ABLS) Course; and
                        (iii) any  additional  professional  education  recommended  by  my
                              Clinical Supervisor.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Azad, undertake to  provide  proof  to  the  College  of  my
                        successful  completion  of  the  Professional  Education, including
                        proof  of  registration  and attendance and participant  assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month  of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its  sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Azad, undertake to complete this  requirement  within  three
                        (3) months of the Effective Date.
                  
                  (d)   I,  Dr.  Azad, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to the College  regarding  my  progress  and  compliance  with  the
                        Professional Education.
                  
            (7)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I,  Dr.  Azad,  undertake  to  inform the College of each and every
                        location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, any hospitals, clinics,  offices,  and  any Independent
                        Health  Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any  jurisdiction
                        (collectively  my  "Practice  Location"  or  "Practice Locations"),
                        within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward,
                        I  further  undertake  to  inform the College of any  and  all  new
                        Practice Locations within five  (5)  days of commencing practice at
                        that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Azad, give my irrevocable consent  to  the  College  to make
                        appropriate  enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution
                        that may have  relevant  information,  in  order for the College to
                        monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (c)   I,  Dr.  Azad, acknowledge that I have executed  the  OHIP  consent
                        form, attached hereto as Appendix "C". 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (8)   I, Dr. Azad, acknowledge  that  all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (9)   I, Dr. Azad, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible
                  for payment of all fees, costs, charges,  expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (10)  I, Dr. Azad, acknowledge that I have read and  understand  the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and
                  executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.
                  
            (11)  I,  Dr. Azad, acknowledge that the College will provide this  Undertaking
                  to any  Chief  of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

            (12)  I, Dr. Azad, acknowledge  that  a  breach  by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking  may  constitute  an  act of professional  misconduct  and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral  of  specified  allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (13)  I,  Dr.  Azad,  acknowledge  that  this  Undertaking  constitutes  terms,
                  conditions,  and  limitations  on  my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (14)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Azad, acknowledge that,  during  the  time  period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall  be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I,  Dr.  Azad,  acknowledge  that,  in addition to this Undertaking
                        being  posted  in  accordance  with  section   (14)(a)  above,  the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                        Following   a   public   complaint,   the   College  conducted   an
                        investigation into Dr. Azad's plastic surgery practice. As a result
                        of the investigation:
                  
                        Dr. Azad will practise under the guidance of  a Clinical Supervisor
                        acceptable to the College for 3 months. 
                  
                        Dr. Azad will engage in professional education in Burn Management.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Azad, acknowledge that this Undertaking  remains  in  effect
                        until the College determines its terms are satisfied.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (15)  I,  Dr.  Azad,  give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating  my completion of the Professional Education and
                  to all Clinical Supervisors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising  from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my 
                        practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from  the  monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (16)  I, Dr. Azad, give my irrevocable consent to  the  College  to provide all
                  Chiefs  of  Staff  with any information the College has that led  to  the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (17)  I, Dr. Azad, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate my
                  completion  of  the  Professional   Education,   and   to   all  Clinical
                  Supervisors, and Chiefs of Staff, to disclose to the College,  and to one
                  another, any of the following:

                  (a)   any information relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any   information  relevant  to  the  provisions  of  the  Clinical
                        Supervisor's   undertaking   set   out  at  Appendix  "A"  to  this
                        Undertaking;
                  
                  (c)   any  information  relevant  for  the  purposes   of  monitoring  my
                        compliance with this Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (d)   any  information which comes to their attention in  the  course  of
                        providing  the  Professional  Education  and  which they reasonably
                        believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.
                  
            (2 of 2)
            1.    Dr. Sanjay Mahendra Azad may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a setting that is approved by the Chair, Division  of  Clinical
                        Sciences,  Northern  Ontario  School of Medicine, in which Dr. Azad
                        holds an academic appointment at  the  rank of Assistant Professor,
                        and
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires  seven  years from
                  the  date  of  issuance  or  when  Dr. Azad  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews  the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that  Dr.  Azad's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional  conduct,  or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does  not  receive  an  annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Azad's certificate of
                        registration, following consideration of  the  practice  assessment
                        report. 
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on May 29, 2013. In accordance with paragraphs
                  2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration
                  Committee, automatically expire on May 28, 2020.

                                          
                                          

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: April 30, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Sanjay Mahendra Azad to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 30, 2019:

Following a public complaint, the College conducted an investigation into Dr. Azad’s plastic surgery practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Azad will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 3 months.

Dr. Azad will engage in professional education in Burn Management.