THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 12:24:08 PM
Azad, Sanjay Mahendra
CPSO#:
100465
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 May 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
29 May 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi
Education: Armed Forces Medical College, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Medical Centre
360 - 63 Algoma St N
Thunder Bay ON P7A 4Z6
Phone: (807) 345-5455
Electoral District: 09
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst) |
Hearst |
Sault Area Hospital |
Sault Ste. Marie |
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay |
Thunder Bay |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:29 May 2013 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 29 May 2013 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 May 2013 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 25 May 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 30 Apr 2019 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 May 2019 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Jul 2019 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Jul 2019 |
|
Active |