skip to content

Ayeni, Olawale Olugbenga

CPSO#: 96628

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Aug 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Aug 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Obafemi Awolowo University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Red Hill Medical Group
337 Queenston Road
Ste 200
Hamilton ON  L8K 1H7
Phone: (905) 549-8863
Fax: (905) 549-4706 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Joseph's Healthcare Centre
50 Charlton Avenue E
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

St. Peter's Residence
125 Redfern Ave
Hamilton ON  L9C 7W9
Canada
Phone: (905) 383-0448
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

HHS/St. Peter's Hospital
88 Maplewood Ave
Hamilton ON  L8M 1W9
Canada
Phone: (905) 777-3837
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

St. Joseph's Villa
56 Governors Rd
Dundas ON  L9H 5G7
Canada
Phone: (905) 627-3541
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Olawale Ayeni Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 17 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Ayeni ( CPSO# 96628 )

Business Address:
HHS/ St Peter's Hospital
88 Maplewood Avenue
Hamilton ON  L8M 1W9
Phone Number: (905) 777-3837

Business Address:
St Joseph's Villa
56 Governors Road
Dundas ON  L9H 5G7
Phone Number: (905) 627-3541

Business Address:
Red hill Medical Group
200 - 337 Queenston Road
Hamilton ON  L8K 1H7
Phone Number: (905) 549-8863

Business Address:
St Peter's Residence
125 Redfern Avenue
Hamilton ON  L9C 7W9
Phone Number: (905) 383-0448

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation,St. Peter's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Oct 2012 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Aug 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Jan 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Dec 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 May 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 May 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Feb 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 28 Feb 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 22 Feb 2013 Active
 Dr.  Olawale  Olugbenga  Ayeni  may  practise  medicine independently in family
            medicine, only.