THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 7:51:40 AM
Ayeni, Olawale Olugbenga
CPSO#:
96628
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Aug 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Aug 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Obafemi Awolowo University, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Red Hill Medical Group
337 Queenston Road
Ste 200
Hamilton ON L8K 1H7
Phone: (905) 549-8863
Fax: (905) 549-4706
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation,St. Peter's Hospital |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:24 Oct 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Aug 2011 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 31 Jan 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Dec 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 May 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 May 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Feb 2013 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 28 Feb 2013 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Feb 2013 |
|
Active |