skip to content

Mortada, Awad Abdul Hadi

CPSO#: 110671

MEMBER STATUS
Suspended as of 17 Sep 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 16 Sep 2022

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education: University of Damascus Faculty of Medici, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Mortada Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 16 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mortada ( CPSO# 110671)

Business Address:
61 Dover Street
Chatham ON  N7L 1S7
Phone Number: (519) 397-5588

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2022
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Discipline Committee Effective: 16 Sep 2022
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 17 Sep 2022

Previous Hearings

Committee: Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal
Decision Date: 16 Sep 2022
Summary:

The Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal found that Dr. Mortada committed professional misconduct in that he was found guilty of an offence relevant to his suitability to practise and engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct. These findings relate to Dr. Mortada having been found guilty of:
 
(a) assault, contrary to s. 266 of the Criminal Code;
(b) uttering death threats, contrary to s. 264.1 of the Criminal Code; and
(c) failing to comply with recognizance, contrary to s. 145(3) of the Criminal Code.

 
The Tribunal ordered that:
 
1. Dr. Mortada attend before the panel to be reprimanded;
2. the Registrar suspend Dr. Mortada’s certificate of registration for eight months commencing September 17, 2022;
3. the Registrar place terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Mortada’s certificate of registration; and
4. Dr. Mortada pay the College costs in the amount of $6,000 by October 16, 2022.
 
The panel’s reasons for decisions will be released shortly. OPSDT reasons are also available at www.opsdt.ca and https://www.canlii.org/en/on/onpsdt/. The exhibits, including the Agreed Statement of Facts, can be obtained by contacting the Tribunal Office at [email protected].


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)

Concerns

Source: Other
Active Date: July 28, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Findings of Guilt

Awad Mortada was found guilty of the following offences:

1. Assault, contrary to Section 266 of the Criminal Code of Canada.
2. Uttering threats to cause death, contrary to Section 264.1(1)(a) of the Criminal Code of Canada.
3. Breach of recognizance (release condition), contrary to Section 145(3) of the Criminal Code of Canada.

Date: March 8, 2019

SENTENCE: [June 24, 2019] Suspended sentence with 2 years’ probation; DNA Order; prohibited from possessing weapons for 5 years.
For breach of recognizance, sentenced to three days (served before sentencing), with 2 years’ concurrent probation.