THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 6:06:20 AM
Mortada, Awad Abdul Hadi
CPSO#:
110671
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 May 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 May 2023
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Damascus Faculty of Medici, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
61 Dover St
Chatham ON N7L 1S7
Phone: (519) 397-5588
Fax: (519) 397-5566
Electoral District: 01
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance |
Chatham |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AWAD ABDUL HADI MORTADA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORTADA is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jul 2016 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 16 Sep 2022 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 16 Sep 2022 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee |
Effective: 17 Sep 2022 |
Suspension of registration removed |
Effective: 17 May 2023 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 May 2023 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal
Decision Date: 16 Sep 2022
Summary:
The Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal found that Dr. Mortada committed professional misconduct in that he was found guilty of an offence relevant to his suitability to practise and engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct. These findings relate to Dr. Mortada having been found guilty of:
(a) assault, contrary to s. 266 of the Criminal Code;
(b) uttering death threats, contrary to s. 264.1 of the Criminal Code; and
(c) failing to comply with recognizance, contrary to s. 145(3) of the Criminal Code.
The Tribunal ordered that:
1. Dr. Mortada attend before the panel to be reprimanded;
2. the Registrar suspend Dr. Mortada’s certificate of registration for eight months commencing September 17, 2022;
3. the Registrar place terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Mortada’s certificate of registration; and
4. Dr. Mortada pay the College costs in the amount of $6,000 by October 16, 2022.
More detail can be found in the reasons for decision linked below. OPSDT reasons are also available at www.opsdt.ca and https://www.canlii.org/en/on/onpsdt/. The exhibits, including the Agreed Statement of Facts, can be obtained by contacting the Tribunal Office at [email protected].
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): 2022-09-16
Concerns
Source:
Other
Active Date: July 28, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Findings of Guilt
Awad Mortada was found guilty of the following offences:
1. Assault, contrary to Section 266 of the Criminal Code of Canada.
2. Uttering threats to cause death, contrary to Section 264.1(1)(a) of the Criminal Code of Canada.
3. Breach of recognizance (release condition), contrary to Section 145(3) of the Criminal Code of Canada.
Date: March 8, 2019
SENTENCE: [June 24, 2019] Suspended sentence with 2 years’ probation; DNA Order; prohibited from possessing weapons for 5 years.
For breach of recognizance, sentenced to three days (served before sentencing), with 2 years’ concurrent probation.