skip to content

Archer, Lori Anne

CPSO#: 94323

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 29 Dec 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 02 Dec 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Calgary, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 23 Aug 2010 to 19 Sep 2010
EL - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2013 to 31 Mar 2013
EL - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 30 Sep 2013 to 03 Nov 2013
EL - Orthopedic Surgery

Western University, 02 Dec 2013 to 29 Dec 2013
EL - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Nov 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Dec 2013