THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 1:53:46 AM
Archer, Lori Anne
CPSO#:
94323
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
29 Dec 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
02 Dec 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: University of Calgary, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 23 Aug 2010 to 19 Sep 2010
EL - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2013 to 31 Mar 2013
EL - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 30 Sep 2013 to 03 Nov 2013
EL - Orthopedic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 02 Dec 2013 to 29 Dec 2013
EL - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Aug 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Sep 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Mar 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Sep 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 03 Nov 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Dec 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Dec 2013 |