skip to content

Antonescu, Raluca

CPSO#: 89943

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Romanian

Education:University of Montreal, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
705 Mackay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Phone: (613) 732-2811
Fax: (613) 732-9986 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Raluca Antonescu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Antonescu ( CPSO# 89943 )

Business Address:
705 Mackay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Phone Number: (613) 732-2811

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RALUCA ANTONESCU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANTONESCU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 21 Oct 2008 to 20 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 21 Oct 2009 to 20 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 21 Oct 2010 to 20 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 21 Oct 2011 to 20 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 21 Oct 2012 to 12 May 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 13 May 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 12 May 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 13 May 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014