THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
13/05/24 5:29:03 AM
Antonescu, Raluca
CPSO#:
89943
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Romanian
Education: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médeci, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
705 Mackay Street
Pembroke ON K8A 1G8
Phone: (613) 732-2811
Fax: (613) 732-9986
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Pembroke Regional Hospital |
Pembroke |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RALUCA ANTONESCU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANTONESCU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 21 Oct 2008 to 20 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 21 Oct 2009 to 20 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 21 Oct 2010 to 20 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 21 Oct 2011 to 20 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 21 Oct 2012 to 12 May 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 13 May 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 12 May 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 13 May 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Oct 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2014 |