skip to content

Antonenko, Alexander

CPSO#: 94655

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Dec 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 09 Dec 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Crimean State Medical University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit #6
10660 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 3C9
Phone: (905) 237-1755
Fax: (905) 597-7844 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

PO Box 910
NorWest Community Health Center
99 Skinner Ave
Longlac ON  P0T 2A0
Canada
Phone: 807-876-2271
Fax: 807-876-2473
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Antonenko Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 06 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Antonenko ( CPSO# 94655 )
Dr. I. Polyakov ( CPSO# 100025)

Business Address:
6 - 10660 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 3C9
Phone Number: (905) 237-1755

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Geraldton District Hospital Geraldton
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:15 Aug 2012 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Dec 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Dec 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 08 Jun 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 16 Mar 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2012 Active
 Dr. Alexander Antonenko may practise medicine independently in Family Medicine,
            only.