THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 6:56:30 AM
Antonenko, Alexander
CPSO#:
94655
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Dec 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
09 Dec 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hebrew, Ukrainian
Education: Crimean State Medical University, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit #6
10660 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON L4C 3C9
Phone: (905) 237-1755
Fax: (905) 597-7844
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital |
Vaughan |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:15 Aug 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 09 Dec 2010 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Dec 2010 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 08 Jun 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Mar 2012 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 16 Mar 2012 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Mar 2012 |
|
Active |