skip to content

Angell, Walter Frederick

CPSO#: 20794

MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Fitness to Practise Committee as of 08 Apr 1999
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 08 Apr 1999
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:13 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1967
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 18 Nov 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 1999
Revoked: Fitness to Practice Committee. Effective: 08 Apr 1999

Previous Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Committee: Fitness To Practise
Decision Date: 08 Apr 1999
Summary:

 In April 1999, the Fitness to Practise Committee found Dr. Angell to be incapacitated.  
 Subsequently, the Committee ordered the Registrar to revoke Dr. Angell(s certificate of 
 registration.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 08 Apr 1999