THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 5:46:09 AM
Angell, Walter Frederick
CPSO#:
20794
MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Fitness to Practise Committee as of
08 Apr 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
23 Feb 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1966
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:13 Nov 1972 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1966 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 1967 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 18 Nov 1998 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Feb 1999 |
Revoked: Fitness to Practice Committee. |
Effective: 08 Apr 1999 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Fitness to Practice
Decision Date: 08 Apr 1999
Summary:
In April 1999, the Fitness to Practise Committee found Dr. Angell to be incapacitated. Subsequently, the Committee ordered the Registrar to revoke Dr. Angell(s certificate of registration.
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 08 Apr 1999