skip to content

Angelini, Paola

CPSO#: 87153

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 09 Nov 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Turin, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 08 Aug 2007
PEAP - CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 09 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Aug 2011
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Oct 2016
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2016