THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 8:27:36 AM
Angelini, Paola
CPSO#:
87153
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
31 Dec 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
09 Nov 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Turin, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 08 Aug 2007
PEAP - CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 09 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Aug 2011
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Oct 2016
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Aug 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Jul 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Aug 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Sep 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Oct 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Nov 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2016 |