skip to content

Amir, Eitan

CPSO#: 89383

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Mar 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 15 Mar 2012
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of Manchester, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Division of Medical Oncology
610 University Avenue, 700U
Room 7-721
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-4501 Ext. 5181
Fax: (416) 946-6546 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Eitan Amir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Amir ( CPSO# 89383 )

Business Address:
UHN Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Division of Medical Oncology
700 University Avenue
Room 7-721
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone Number: (416) 946-4501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Oncology Effective: 01 Jul 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 14 Mar 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 20 Sep 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 21 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 16 Mar 2012
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Mar 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2017

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2017 Active
             1.    Dr. Eitan Amir may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        University of Toronto, in which Dr. Amir holds an academic
                        appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Amir no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.