THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 5:25:54 AM
Amir, Eitan
CPSO#:
89383
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Mar 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
15 Mar 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hebrew
Education: Manchester Medical School, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
UHN Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Division of Medical Oncology
610 University Avenue, 700U
Room 7-721
Toronto ON M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-4501 Ext. 5181
Fax: (416) 946-6546
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:01 Jul 2017 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:14 Mar 2012 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 20 Sep 2008
PEAP - CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 21 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 16 Mar 2012
CF - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Sep 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Mar 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Mar 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Aug 2022 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Aug 2022 |
|
Active |