skip to content

Alyahya, Bader Abdulrahman I

CPSO#: 88197

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 May 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 May 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Saud University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
King Saud University
King Saud Medical City
Emergency Medicine Department
Riyadh 11472
Riyadh 6805
Saudi Arabia
Phone: +966118066590

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Saudi Arabia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective:23 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Pharmacology Effective:13 Dec 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BADER ABDULRAHMAN I ALYAHYA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALYAHYA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 07 Apr 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PEAP - R - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 02 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 03 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 26 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 27 Sep 2011 to 24 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 25 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 May 2016