THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 17:31:29 PM
Alyahya, Bader Abdulrahman I
CPSO#:
88197
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 May 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 May 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: King Saud University, Riyadh College of, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
King Saud University
King Saud Medical City
Emergency Medicine Department
Riyadh 11472
Riyadh 6805
Saudi Arabia
Phone: +966118066590
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Saudi Arabia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:23 Sep 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Clinical Pharmacology |
Effective:13 Dec 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BADER ABDULRAHMAN I ALYAHYA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALYAHYA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 07 Apr 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PEAP - R - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 02 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 03 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 26 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 27 Sep 2011 to 24 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 25 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 07 Apr 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Sep 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Sep 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 May 2016 |