skip to content

Alsheikh, Sultan Omar A

CPSO#: 96987

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Aug 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Aug 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Saud University, Riyadh College of, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 502
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone: (416) 840-0330
Fax: (416) 840-0333 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Scarborough and Rouge Hospital
General Campus
3050 Lawrence Ave East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Canada
Phone: (416) 495-2400
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Saudi Arabia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:06 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SULTAN OMAR A ALSHEIKH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALSHEIKH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 24 Oct 2011 to 20 Nov 2011
EL - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 7 - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 7 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Nov 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2017