THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 11:49:14 AM
Alsheikh, Sultan Omar A
CPSO#:
96987
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Aug 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Aug 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: King Saud University, Riyadh College of, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 502
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON M1P 2T7
Phone: (416) 840-0330
Fax: (416) 840-0333
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Saudi Arabia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:06 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Vascular Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SULTAN OMAR A ALSHEIKH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALSHEIKH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 24 Oct 2011 to 20 Nov 2011
EL - Vascular Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Vascular Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 7 - Vascular Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 7 - Vascular Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Oct 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Nov 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 12 Jan 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Aug 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Aug 2017 |