skip to content

Alomari, Mohammad Ghaleb

CPSO#: 88235

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Aug 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Aug 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Jordan, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
Department of Pathology
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 254-5577 Ext. 52244 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Alomari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 08 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Alomari ( CPSO# 88235 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
Department of Pathology
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective:15 May 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD GHALEB ALOMARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALOMARI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Apr 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Apr 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 Apr 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2009