THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 1:57:03 AM
Alomari, Mohammad Ghaleb
CPSO#:
88235
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Aug 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Aug 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Jordan, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
Department of Pathology
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 254-5577 Ext. 52244
Electoral District: 01
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Manitoba
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Windsor Regional Hospital |
Windsor |
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:15 May 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD GHALEB ALOMARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALOMARI is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Apr 2008 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Apr 2008 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 14 Apr 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Aug 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Aug 2009 |