skip to content

Al-Khafaji, Ali Mohammed Abdul-Razak

CPSO#: 108301

MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 21 Sep 2022
EXPIRY DATE
10 Mar 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Dec 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education: University of Al-Mustansiriyah College o, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Al-Khafaji Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 8 2021

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Saskatchewan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Mar 2021
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 21 Sep 2022

Previous Hearings

Committee: Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal
Decision Date: 21 Sep 2022
Summary:

On September 21, 2022, the Tribunal found that Dr. Al-Khafaji sexually abused Patient A and engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct by engaging in a sexual relationship with Patient A, including sexual intercourse. The Tribunal also found that Dr. Al-Khafaji engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct by violating appropriate doctor-patient boundaries, including going on trips with Patient A and renting a condominium for Patient A.
 
The Tribunal ordered that:
 
1. Dr. Al-Khafaji attend before the panel to be reprimanded;
2. the Registrar revoke Dr. Al-Khafaji’s certificate of registration immediately;
3. Dr. Al-Khafaji reimburse the College for funding provided to patients under the program required under s. 85.7 of the Code, by posting an irrevocable letter of credit or other security acceptable to the College, within 30 days of the order in the amount of $16,060.00;
4. Dr. Al-Khafaji pay the College costs in the amount of $6,000 by October 21, 2022.
 
The panel’s reasons for decisions will be released shortly. OPSDT reasons are also available at www.opsdt.ca and https://www.canlii.org/en/on/onpsdt/. The exhibits, including the Agreed Statement of Facts, can be obtained by contacting the Tribunal Office at [email protected].


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): 2022-09-21