THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 9:40:26 AM
Al-Khafaji, Ali Mohammed Abdul-Razak
CPSO#:
108301
MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of
21 Sep 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Dec 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Al-Mustansiriyah College o, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Al-Khafaji Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 8 2021
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Saskatchewan
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Dec 2015 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 10 Mar 2021 |
Revoked: Discipline Committee. |
Effective: 21 Sep 2022 |
Revocation by Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal |
Effective: 21 Sep 2022 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal
Decision Date: 21 Sep 2022
Summary:
On September 21, 2022, the Tribunal found that Dr. Al-Khafaji sexually abused Patient A and engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct by engaging in a sexual relationship with Patient A, including sexual intercourse. The Tribunal also found that Dr. Al-Khafaji engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct by violating appropriate doctor-patient boundaries, including going on trips with Patient A and renting a condominium for Patient A.
The Tribunal ordered that:
1. Dr. Al-Khafaji attend before the panel to be reprimanded;
2. the Registrar revoke Dr. Al-Khafaji’s certificate of registration immediately;
3. Dr. Al-Khafaji reimburse the College for funding provided to patients under the program required under s. 85.7 of the Code, by posting an irrevocable letter of credit or other security acceptable to the College, within 30 days of the order in the amount of $16,060;
4. Dr. Al-Khafaji pay the College costs in the amount of $6,000 by October 21, 2022.
More detail can be found in the reasons for decision linked below. OPSDT reasons are also available at www.opsdt.ca and https://www.canlii.org/en/on/onpsdt/. The exhibits, including the Agreed Statement of Facts, can be obtained by contacting the Tribunal Office at [email protected].
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): 2022-09-21