skip to content

Alhazmi, Areej Ibrahim Saleem

CPSO#: 90295

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Sep 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 29 Sep 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:04 May 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective:27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 15 Mar 2009 to 25 May 2009
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jan 2010 to 01 Mar 2010
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 03 Mar 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 04 Mar 2011 to 03 Mar 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 04 Mar 2012 to 02 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 03 Mar 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 02 Mar 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

Western University, 03 Mar 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 02 Mar 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Western University, 03 Mar 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Nephrology

Western University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Nephrology

Western University, 29 Sep 2016 to 31 Aug 2017
CF - Nephrology

Western University, 01 Sep 2017 to 28 Sep 2017
CF - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 May 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Sep 2017